Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reagan, Tandy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ashton R. Anderson, against Karr, Kollin, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryContract: Other |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served K Karr K Karr |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Karr, Kollin Served 04/21/2021 Returned 04/22/2021 | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Issuance Request Request for Issuance |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.