Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harris, Pat, Harris, Oliver, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bob Hanna, against Davis, Amos, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served A. Davis A. Davis |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation A.Davis A.Davis |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Davis, Amos Served 03/30/2021 Returned 04/01/2021 | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Request for Issuance Request for Issuance |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Plaintiffs' Original Petition Plaintiffs' Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.