Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Berry, Tina, Ramsey, Jaylnne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mark A Cevallos, against James, Rebbeca, represented by Staci H. Collins, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Wheeler, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWheeler, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas)
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Of Dismissal
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment Letter 2
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter Certification - Rebecca James - Rebecca James Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter Certification - Tina Berry - Tina Berry Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter Certification - Jalynne Ramsey - Jalynne Ramsey Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Scheduling Order
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Written Discovery
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate Of Written Discovery
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response
Judge: Wheeler, Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.