Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Jenny Henley, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Thomas M. Wheeler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas M. Wheeler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Relating To Criminal Matter |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Bond Reduction (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) 12/15/2020 Reset by Court to 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Reset by Court to 01/05/2021 01/05/2021 Reset by Court to 01/06/2021 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Bond Hearing Reset 1.5.21 Bond Hearing Reset 1.5.21 |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Bond Hearing Reset 12.29.20 Bond Hearing Reset 12.29.20 |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Bond Hearing 12.15.20 Bond Hearing 12.15.20 |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BOND REDUCTION APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BOND REDUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.