Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shomansurov, Bakhodir, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases case represented by Bob Hanna, against Hantman, Judith, Avitan, Jeremy, represented by Chaile Allen, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts with Thomas M. Wheeler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas M. Wheeler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Entry Hearing on Defendant Hantman MSJ; Bob Hanna and Chaile Allen; Arguments made; Under advisement (TMW); Letter ruling to be made Hearing on Defendant Hantman MSJ; Bob Hanna and Chaile Allen; Arguments made; Under advisement (TMW); Letter ruling to be made |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Mtn (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheeler, Thomas) Summary Judgment & Objection and Mtn to Strike Discovery Responses Summary Judgment & Objection and Mtn to Strike Discovery Responses |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Second Amended Answer | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion for Summary Judgment for Summary Judgment |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Amended Motion for Summary Judgment on Amended Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion for Summary Judgment for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.