Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Unrue, Charles, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jack D. Hurd, against Boyd, Katherine Lynn, represented by Pharra Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Taylor County, TX, . Taylor County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTaylor County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Boyd, Katherine Lynn Served 11/27/2020 Returned 12/01/2020 | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation K.Boyd K |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Request For Issuance | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request For Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.