Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2017 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
IV-D ORIGINAL PETITION IN SAPCR(AOP)
Date: January 27, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON LAMONT DEWUAN PRIMUS-On 04/17/2017
Date: January 27, 2017IV-D ID SHEET
Date: January 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 13, dated 09/26/2017 | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 11, dated 09/06/2017 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NONSUITED/CLOSED ON 09/28/17 | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 11 RET UNEXEC(COURTNEY MICHELLE LOWRY) On 09/26/2017 | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Service fee for # 11 | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIVED AG SERVICE PACKET - CML |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.