Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2017 |
CategoryEstablishment Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
RETURNED ENVELOPE - BRAY ONNI PATRYCE VALES
Date: July 26, 2018IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: July 02, 2018Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 07/16/2018
Date: July 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED ENVELOPE - BRAY ONNI PATRYCE VALES | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 07/16/2018 | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NONSUIT | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE - BRAY ONNI PATRYCE VALES | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | AJ'S ORDER (6/27/18 @ 8:15AM) | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | IV-D NOT OF HRG 03/28/2018 8:15AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.