Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts with Christopher R. Wolfe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher R. Wolfe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2017 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 05, 2017DEPUTY COURT REPORTER'S STATEMENT
Date: October 11, 2017DEFAULT PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATION PROJECT DEFAULT-CREATED ON 07/06/2020 MAILED TO: 3200 GORDON AVE FORT WORTH TX 76110. -SS | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created on 06/06/2019 | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COSTBILL (COLLECTIONS) FOR $303 CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MORALES MAILED TO: 3200 GORDON AVE, FORT WORTH TX 76110 -KK | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS ADDRESS UPDATE | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Costbill (Short) for $303-Due on 07/05/2018 CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MORALES | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURN | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | WRIT TEMP INJ Tr# 11 RET EXEC(CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MORALES) On 10/13/2017 | |
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPUTY COURT REPORTER'S STATEMENT | |
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.