Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2017 |
CategoryContract, Other Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CIT-ISSUED ON HAHNFIELD HOFFER & STANFORD PLLC-On 07/13/2017
Date: July 12, 2017PLTF'S ORIG PET(ATTACHED CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET)
Date: July 12, 2017CIT-ISSUED ON MYD STRUCTURAL ENGINEERS LLC-On 07/13/2017
Date: July 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | PAPER REC DESTROYED | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | EFILE REFUND #E018803994-0 Check # 51008 | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Accounting notification from #111 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND REQUEST FORM-CREATED ON 01/17/2020 | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Adjustment for # 15 CIT NOT USED | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ***AGREED ORD OF DISM W/PREJ (COST INCURRED)*** | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) AGRD ORD OF DISM | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | JT MTN TO DISM W/PREJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.