Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2017 |
CategoryModification-Custody |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
T.R.O.-ISSUED ON LOC LE. H/R 03/01/2017 - 10:00-On 02/16/2017
Date: February 13, 2017TRO/ORDER SET HRNG FOR TEMP ORDR-3/1/17 @ 10AM
Date: February 15, 2017RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER-LOC LE
Date: August 31, 2017ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL
Date: October 27, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: February 13, 2017LOC LE'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: October 24, 2017RESP'S ANSWER TO PTNR'S MOTION SIGN TEMP ORDER
Date: January 16, 2018Citation-ISSUED ON LOC LE-On 02/16/2017
Date: February 13, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 7 RET EXEC(LOC LE) On 02/21/2017
Date: March 02, 2017ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4479
Date: July 26, 2017MOTION FOR TRO-DID NOT SET
Date: October 16, 2017MOT TO REINSTATE CASE ON DKT
Date: August 18, 2017CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET
Date: February 13, 2017SERVICE RETURN
Date: March 02, 2017NOTICE OF HRG FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS-11/16/17@9:30AM
Date: November 03, 2017AJ REPORT
Date: November 16, 2017Citation Tr# 5 RET EXEC(LOC LE) On 02/21/2017
Date: March 02, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 07/26/2017 Image ID 4452 Signed 05/26/2017
Date: May 26, 20172ND AMENDED MOTION REHEARING FOR TEMP ORDER**TO LY
Date: December 18, 2017ORDER TO REINSTATE CASE ON DOCKET
Date: August 21, 2017NOTICE OF HRG SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS-11/16/17 @9:30AM
Date: November 03, 2017L LE'S AMENDED COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: December 21, 2017DEFAULT TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: January 17, 2018TEMPORARY INJUNCTIONS
Date: November 16, 2017NOT OF HRG TO SIGN TEMP ORD - 1/17/18 @ 9AM
Date: January 02, 2018(PROPOSED)HEARING CONFIRMATION LETTER
Date: January 11, 20182ND AMENDED MOT TO HRG ON TEMP ORD - NOT SIGNED
Date: January 02, 2018RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: December 12, 2017(PROPOSED) TRO
Date: October 13, 2017INVENTORY/APPRAISEMENT OF LOC LE
Date: February 07, 2018INCOME W/HOLDING CHILD SUPPORT-(CC:C/S)
Date: February 21, 2018SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPO BY ATTY MUNOZ ON LOCLE
Date: February 14, 2018REPORTERS CERTIFICATE/FILING CERT VIDEOTAPED ORAL DEPOSITION OF TUYETTRINH THAI
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEP OF T THAI
Date: January 17, 2018PRETRIAL CONF ORDER-TRIAL 4/25/18 @ 9 AM
Date: January 17, 2018MOTION QUASH NOTICE FOR ORAL DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2018(PROPOSED)NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 23, 2018MOT TO QUASH NOT FOR ORAL DEPOSITION OF LOC LE** NOT SET
Date: January 24, 2018MOTION TO ORDER T THAI'S APPEARANCE AT DEPOSITION
Date: January 23, 2018PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: January 09, 2019AUSTIN FORM
Date: June 11, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: June 11, 2018AMENDED INVENTORY/APPRAISEMENT OF LOC LE
Date: February 07, 2018ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR C/S (CC:C/S)
Date: January 25, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - NOT SET
Date: January 25, 2018NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 06/20/2018 Image ID 4629 Signed 04/26/2018
Date: April 26, 2018MEDICAL C/S ORDER
Date: June 11, 2018TEMP RESTRAINING ORD/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD ** TO LY
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE HRG MOT SIGN FINAL DECREE/MEDICAL & C/S ORD6/11/18 @ 9AM
Date: May 29, 2018MOTION TO QUASH & FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 15, 2018REPORTER'S CERT OF DEP OF L LE
Date: March 22, 2018INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT (CC:C/S)
Date: June 11, 2018FINAL DECREE DIV (CC:ATTY PTNR)
Date: June 11, 2018PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUB OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: February 15, 2019Citation-ISSUED ON TUYETTRINH THAI-On 01/10/2019
Date: January 09, 2019ORDER ON PTNR'S MOT SUB SERVICE PROCESS- APPROVED
Date: February 15, 2019(PROPOSED) ORDER ON PETITIONER'S MOT SUB SERVICE OF PROCESS (e-ly0
Date: February 15, 2019ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: June 04, 2019ORDER FOR ACCESS coordination & appointing access
Date: June 04, 2019ORDER FOR CUSTODY EVALUATION
Date: June 04, 2019RESP'S CERTIF OF WRITTEN DISCV DIRECTED TO PTNR
Date: June 27, 2019TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD - 5/22/2019 @ 10AM
Date: May 08, 2019Subpoena-ISSUED ON RENE J SANDOVAL-On 05/17/2019
Date: May 16, 2019T.R.O.-ISSUED ON TUYETTRINH THAI. H/R 05/22/2019 - 10;00-On 05/10/2019
Date: May 10, 2019Subpoena-ISSUED ON DETECTIVE SARGEANT TIMOTHY PAULSON-On 05/17/2019
Date: May 16, 2019ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT - 6/4/19 @ 1:30PM
Date: May 22, 2019Subpoena-ISSUED ON OFFICER PHILLIP NORTON-On 05/17/2019
Date: May 16, 2019Subpoena-ISSUED ON HOA NGUYEN-On 05/17/2019
Date: May 16, 2019EXEC SUBPOENA NOT ISSUED BY DC - H.NGUYEN
Date: June 03, 2019OATH/AFFIRMATION/APPR ORDER - P.NORTON 6/4/19 @ 1:30PM (E-LY)
Date: May 22, 2019OATH/AFFIRMATION/APPR ORD - R.SANDOVAL - 6/4/19 @ 1:30PM (E-LY)
Date: May 22, 2019COUNTERPETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: June 03, 20191ST AMENDED PETITION TO MODIFY PCR
Date: June 04, 2019MOT TO MOD TEMP ORD AND FOR ADD'L TEMP ORDS
Date: November 04, 2019SERVICE RETURN
Date: May 21, 2019MOTION TO SIGN FINAL DECREE DIV/MEDICAL C/S ORDER
Date: May 25, 2018SERVICE RETURN-CITATION
Date: May 02, 2019Subpoena Tr# 119 RET EXEC On 05/17/2019
Date: May 20, 2019SERVICE RETURN - SUBPOENA
Date: May 20, 2019APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA
Date: May 16, 2019T.R.O. Tr# 107 RET EXEC(TUYETTRINH THAI) On 05/10/2019
Date: May 13, 2019PTNR'S CERTIF OF WRITTEN DISCV DIRECTED TO RESP
Date: July 01, 2019RULE 11 AGREEMENT (E-LY)
Date: June 19, 2019SERVICE RETURN SUBPOENA
Date: May 20, 2019MOTION TO DENY RELIEF IN SUIT MODIFY PCR
Date: May 15, 2019SERVICE REQUEST FORM (E-LY)
Date: May 08, 2019W/H ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 26, 2018SERVICE RETURN-TRO
Date: May 13, 2019Citation Tr# 93 RET EXEC(TUYETTRINH THAI) On 05/01/2019
Date: May 02, 2019Subpoena Tr# 113 RET EXEC On 05/20/2019
Date: May 21, 2019MILITARY STATUS DECLARATION
Date: February 14, 2019MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: February 22, 2018CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 16, 2018CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVER
Date: January 26, 2018CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE ORAL DEP OF L LE
Date: January 25, 2018Subpoena Tr# 122 RET EXEC On 05/17/2019
Date: May 20, 2019RESPONDENTS ORIGINAL ANSWER-TUYETTRINH THAI
Date: May 15, 2019SERVICE REQUEST FORM(EMAILED DOC PROD)
Date: January 09, 2019BLUE CARD
Date: June 11, 2018PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS
Date: February 14, 2019CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: January 10, 2018CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 13, 2017MOTION TO SIGN TEMPORARY ORDERS
Date: December 27, 2017SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: November 01, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: July 26, 2017AGREED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: October 26, 2017APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL-A KAMPHAUS
Date: August 30, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: July 26, 2017LETTER OF REPRESENTATION-ATTY FOSTER
Date: November 03, 20171ST AMENDED PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: November 01, 2017DEFAULT ORD SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS/ORD MOTION STRIKE EVIDENTIARY FACTS FROM PLEADINGS
Date: November 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOT TO MOD TEMP ORD AND FOR ADD'L TEMP ORDS | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | VACATION LTR(E-LY) | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #145 | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | PTNR'S CERTIF OF WRITTEN DISCV DIRECTED TO RESP | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | RESP'S CERTIF OF WRITTEN DISCV DIRECTED TO PTNR | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT (E-LY) | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ACCESS coordination & appointing access | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CUSTODY EVALUATION | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | 1ST AMENDED PETITION TO MODIFY PCR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.