Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2017 |
CategoryEstablishment Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
STATUS HEARING ORDER
Date: October 18, 2017IV-D RTN OF SVC(TNF)
Date: February 28, 2017CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: February 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PAY VOUCHER ($ 1500.00 SONYA CARILLO)CC:AUDITOR | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYVOUCHER ($2300.00/SONYA CARRILLO)CC:AUDITOR | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING/APPROVING PAYMENT TO CRT APPOINTE(ATTORNEY THERESA COPELAND/$400) | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | AUSTIN FORM | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER IN SAPCR | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION MODIFY MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP IN SAPCR | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY SERVICE PLAN EVALUATION | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | PERMANENCY HEARING ORDER BEFORE FINAL ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.