Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2017 |
CategorySuit To Enforce |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
SERVICE RETURN
Date: February 22, 2017Citation Tr# 6 RET EXEC(HOA VAN PHAN) On 02/21/2017
Date: February 22, 2017Citation-ISSUED ON HOA VAN PHAN-On 02/09/2017
Date: January 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Tr# 6 RET EXEC(HOA VAN PHAN) On 02/21/2017 | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation-ISSUED ON HOA VAN PHAN-On 02/09/2017 | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION FOR POST-DIV DIV OF PROPERTY | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A - FINAL DECREE OF DIV | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICE REQUEST FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.