Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2017 |
CategoryEstablishment Iv-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
IV-D ORIGINAL PETITION IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PCR
Date: January 20, 2017CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET
Date: January 20, 2017IV-D Citation W/SVC-ISSUED ON SELINA MARIE RENTERIA-On 05/03/2017
Date: January 20, 2017IV-D ID SHEET
Date: January 20, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 06/28/2017 Image ID 4439 Signed 04/27/2017
Date: April 27, 2017IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 4 RET UNEXEC(SELINA MARIE RENTERIA) On 09/08/2017
Date: September 08, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: June 28, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON JON PAUL MARTINEZ-On 04/21/2017
Date: January 20, 2017ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4465
Date: June 28, 2017BLUE CARD
Date: July 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 15, dated 09/08/2017 | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | IV-D Citation W/SVC Tr# 4 RET UNEXEC(SELINA MARIE RENTERIA) On 09/08/2017 | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Service fee for # 4 | |
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4465 | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP ON 06/28/2017 Image ID 4439 Signed 04/27/2017 | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 4, dated 01/20/2017 | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AG PAYMENT, for transaction 1, dated 01/20/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.