Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
CategoryInterstate - No Tx Cause Iv-D |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
IV-D SERVICE REQUEST
Date: September 25, 2017IV-D NCP ID SHEET (JS)
Date: September 25, 2017IV-D Citation-ISSUED ON JUAN MANUEL SERRATO-On 10/02/2017
Date: September 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AG Credit;transaction# 24 dated 03/04/2019 | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED-JUAN MANUEL SERRATO | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certification of Payment Default-Created on 02/20/2019 | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Costbill (Collections) for $301 JUAN MANUEL SERRATO | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | COLLECTIONS PROCESS STARTED | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 07/24/2018 | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Costbill (AG Only) for $301 JUAN MANUEL SERRATO | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER UNDER UIFSA | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.