Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
LETTER OF PRO/SE ORDER DISMISSAL
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4597
Date: February 27, 2018DOCKET SHEET
Date: February 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER OF PRO/SE ORDER DISMISSAL | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WOP Image ID 4597 | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER OF PRO/SE NOTICE DISMISSAL | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 02/27/2018 Image ID 4538 Signed 12/12/2017 | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL INFORMATION SHEET | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PRO SE INSTRUCTION SHEET | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #4 | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | COPIES - FAMILY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.