Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2017 |
CategoryModification-Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
REINSTATED PER DOCKET SHEET/DISMISSED IN ERROR
Date: October 11, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: March 29, 2018ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Judgment/Decree/Order-Created on 04/05/2018 | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER MODIFYING PARENT CHILD REL (CC:PTNR) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER OF SUPPORT (CC:C/S) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | BLUE CARD | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER OF PRO/SE NOTICE DISMISSAL | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WOP ON 05/22/2018 Image ID 4614 Signed 03/21/2018 | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF SERVICE/CITATION | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | COPIES - FAMILY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.