Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Other Civil, Intellectual Property case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil, Intellectual Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
|
APPELLANT'S MTN FOR REINSTATEMENT AND REHEARING W/ABOVE
Date: February 01, 2018CIT Sec of St-ISSUED ON LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017T.R.O.-ISSUED ON MD REZAUR RAHMAN. H/R 04/25/2017 - 09:30-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017T.R.O.-ISSUED ON FARHANAZ REZA. H/R 04/25/2017 - 09:30-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017CERT OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 11, 2017*REQ FOR FFCL
Date: September 27, 2017***TRO HRG 4/25/17 @ 9:30AM BOND ($2,000.00)
Date: April 11, 2017DEFN'S RESP TO PLTF'S SUPPL TO MTN FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: September 14, 2017*DEFNS NOT OF APPEAL (JURISDICTION)
Date: September 27, 2017PLTF'S RESP TO DEFN'S MTN FOR NEW TRIAL (DEFN LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC)
Date: August 07, 2017ORD (PROPOSED)
Date: September 18, 2017DEFN'S RESP TO PLTFS' RESP TO MTN FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: August 11, 2017CIT Sec of St Tr# 12 RET EXEC(LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC) On 04/13/2017
Date: April 17, 2017CIT-ISSUED ON MD REZAUR RAHMAN-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 16 RET EXEC(MD REZAUR RAHMAN) On 04/11/2017
Date: April 17, 2017PROP ORD
Date: April 19, 2017VAC LTR/R DAVID WEAVER
Date: June 02, 2017LTR TO CONFIRM HRG 6/9/17 @ 10:00
Date: June 08, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: July 05, 2017CIT Tr# 7 RET EXEC(MD REZAUR RAHMAN) On 04/11/2017
Date: April 17, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 17 RET EXEC(FARHANAZ REZA) On 04/12/2017
Date: April 17, 2017PLTF'S SUPPL RESP TO DEFN'S MTN FOR NEW TRIAL (DEFN LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC) W/EXHIBITS
Date: September 12, 2017LTR (CT/APPEALS) RE: JURISDICTION
Date: October 25, 2017*NOT OF PAST DUE FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OFLAW
Date: October 23, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: October 24, 2017*LTR FROM THE CT
Date: October 23, 2017*ABATEMENT ORDER (CT/APPEALS) REM/DUE 11/17/17
Date: October 18, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: December 22, 2017*MEMO OPIN & JUDG (CT/APPEALS) DWOP
Date: January 25, 2018COVER LTR W/ATTACHMENT
Date: February 01, 2018*LTR (CT/APPEALS) NO PAY
Date: January 02, 2018*AMD NOT OF APPEAL/MOT FOR EXT/TIME AND RESPONSE SHOWING GROUNDS FOR CONT THE APPEAL
Date: October 16, 2017*ORD (CT/APPEALS) APPEAL REINSTATED
Date: February 06, 2018******EXHIBIT RECEIPT PLTF'S 1-4******
Date: February 09, 2018*LTR (CT/APPEALS) EXHIBITS
Date: September 07, 2018******EXHIBIT RECEIPT PLTF'S 1-10******
Date: February 09, 2018LTR REQ SUPPL CLERKS REC (23.00 / 11.50)
Date: March 22, 20181ST SUPL CLERK'S REC-EFILED ON 03/22/18
Date: March 22, 2018AFFDT OF SERVICE/TRO MD REZAUR RAHMAN
Date: April 17, 2017AFFDT OF SERVICE/MD REZAUR RAHMAN
Date: April 17, 2017AFFDT OF SERVICE/SNOWFLAKE APPAREL LLC
Date: April 17, 2017CERT OF LKA/MD REZAUR RAHMAN
Date: June 14, 2017CERT OF LKA/SNOWFLAKE APPAREL LLC
Date: June 14, 2017CERT OF LKA/FARHANAZ REZA
Date: June 14, 2017CERT OF LKA/LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC
Date: June 14, 2017Destruction Letter-Created on 09/11/2019
Date: September 11, 2019*MAND (CT/APPEALS) AFFM
Date: September 07, 2018*JDG & OPIN (CT/APPEALS) AFFIRMED
Date: June 21, 2018CLERK'S RECORD-EFILED ON 02/02/2018
Date: February 02, 2018(PROPOSED) ORD
Date: December 12, 2017CLERK'S RECORD-ABATEMENT ORDER EFILED 10/24/17
Date: October 24, 2017ORD (PROPOSED)
Date: December 19, 2017*MEMO OF NO PAY TO COURT OF APPEALS ($111.00)
Date: January 02, 2018*LTR (CT/APPEALS) CR/RR DUE 1/2/18 02-17-331
Date: December 01, 2017PLTF'S MTN TO RELEASE BOND
Date: December 12, 2017***ORD TO RELEASE BOND
Date: December 15, 2017***ORD TO RELEASE BOND NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: December 22, 2017DOCKET SHEET
Date: September 28, 2017*LTR (CT/APPEALS) 02-17-331
Date: October 04, 2017(PROPOSED) ORD
Date: September 15, 2017FIAT (PROP)
Date: August 04, 2017AMD PROP FIAT
Date: August 21, 2017AMD FIAT (HRG 9/8/17 @ 9:30)
Date: August 23, 2017DEFN MTN FOR A NEW TRIAL & AFFDT IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Date: July 21, 2017SIGNED 6/9/17***DEFAULT JDG & PERMANENT INJUNCTION
Date: July 05, 2017AFFDT OF SERVICE/FARHANAZ REZA & MD REZAUR RAHMAN
Date: June 09, 2017*ORD ON MTN TO EXTEND TRO(HRG 6/9/17 @ 10:00AM)
Date: April 19, 2017MTN TO EXTEND TRO
Date: April 19, 2017CIT Tr# 8 RET EXEC(FARHANAZ REZA) On 04/12/2017
Date: April 17, 2017CIT Tr# 6 RET EXEC(SNOWFLAKE APPAREL LLC) On 04/12/2017
Date: April 17, 2017T.R.O. Tr# 18 RET EXEC(LOUISIANA C STORE WHOLESALER INC) On 04/13/2017
Date: April 17, 2017CIT-ISSUED ON FARHANAZ REZA-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017CIT-ISSUED ON SNOWFLAKE APPAREL LLC-On 04/11/2017
Date: April 10, 2017SERVICE REQ FORM
Date: April 10, 2017PLTF'S ORIG PET FOR INJ & OTHER RELIEF
Date: April 10, 2017LTR FROM WEAVER W/CERTIFIED MAIL RECIEPTS
Date: June 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Destruction Letter-Created on 09/11/2019 | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | *LTR (CT/APPEALS) EXHIBITS | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | *MAND (CT/APPEALS) AFFM | |
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event | *JDG & OPIN (CT/APPEALS) AFFIRMED | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | COPIES - CIVIL-(COPY OF SUPPL CLERK'S RECORD) | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #114 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | LTR REQ SUPPL CLERKS REC (23.00 / 11.50) | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | 1ST SUPL CLERK'S REC-EFILED ON 03/22/18 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S RECORD-(SUPPLEMENTAL CLERK'S RECORD) | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED TRANS #111 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.