Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage, Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPEL ORD (PROPOSED)
Date: December 18, 2019FIAT HRG 12/13/19 @ 9:30/DEFN MTN TO COMPEL
Date: December 06, 2019AMD NOT/HRG (12-16-19/2:30) DEFN'S 2ND AMD MTN
Date: December 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | *ORD GRANT CPLT/DEFN BRYANT'S CC AGNST CDEF JANYE | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) ORD GRANT CPLT/DEFN NOT NONSUIT OF CC | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ***TRIAL SETTING ORD; WEEK OF 02/08/2021*** | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PLTF'S NOT FILING AFFDTS MED/BUSN RECS | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CNTR-PLTF/DEFN BRYANT'S NOT OF NONSUIT OF | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ***SETTING ORDER; TRIAL WK OF 9/14/2020*** | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | **AGRD ORD DISM W/PREJ;DEFN BRYANT ONLY;COSTS | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) AGRD ORD OF DISM W/PREJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.