Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2017 |
CategoryContract, Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
(PROPOSED) FINAL DEFAULT JDG
Date: October 16, 2017CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET
Date: August 30, 2017CIT RET JAQUELIN M JONES
Date: September 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ***DEFAULT JDG (COSTS TO DEFN)*** | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ******************CASE CLOSED****************** | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED) FINAL DEFAULT JDG | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | MTN FOR DEFAULT JDGMT | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CIT RET JAQUELIN M JONES | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CIT Tr# 5 RET EXEC(JACQUELIN M JONES) On 09/09/2017 | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | PLTF'S ORIG PET | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CIT-ISSUED ON JACQUELIN M JONES-On 09/07/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.