Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cornelius Butler, Individually, And On Behalf Of The Estate Of Betty Butler, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Curtis Clinesmith, against Tyler Ops Ltc. Inc. D B A Petal Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation, represented by Emily Davenport, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Debra E. Gunter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra E. Gunter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Cornelius Butler, individually and on behalf of the Estate of Betty Butler, against Tyler Ops LTC. Inc. d/b/a Petal Hill Nursing & Rehabilitation. The complaint alleges medical negligence and corporate negl...
Original Answer
Date: September 07, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 24, 2021Answer
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gunter, Debby) Result: Hearing Held | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant Tyler Ops LTC. Inc. dba Petal Hill Nursi Answer |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Butler.Resp to Ch 74 Obj Am Report.FINAL w exhibits.KFB-8.23.23 Answer |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Defendant Tyler Ops LTC. INC. Notice |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Amended Expe Miscellaneous |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Butler.Notice Am 74 Report-6.6.23 Notice |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandate Confirmed | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter from Court of Appeals |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.