Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chambers, Mark, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by J. Scott Perry, against Blue Star Cafe, University Of Texas Health Science At Tyler, represented by J. Redd Tripp, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Jackson, Austin Reeve presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackson, Austin Reeve Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Original Answer
Date: January 19, 2022RESPONSE
Date: January 19, 2022Motion to Set Aside Order
Date: December 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Kennedy, Christi, Jackson, Austin Reeve)
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
UTHSCT's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PL Response to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment RESPONSE Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Other CANCELED Motion Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Kennedy, Christi, Jackson, Austin Reeve) Other Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
UTS Motion to Set Aside Default Judgement with Exh Motion to Set Aside Order Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Letter
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Kennedy, Christi, Jackson, Austin Reeve)
Judge: Jackson, Austin Reeve |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.