Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Farris, Bert, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jon M. Rowan, against Underhill, Dylan, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Russell, Kerry L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell, Kerry L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Without Prosecution |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) Result: Hearing Held Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
ROS - Dylan Underhill Citation Returned Served Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued to Dylan Underhill Citation Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Petition for Partition Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.