Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Owens, Todd Mathew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ashcraft, Heidi Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Prove Up Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet - Paperless | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
321 NOTICE OF SETTING - Jennifer Notice of Setting |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Second Amended Stipulation/Affidavit of Evidence in Suit for Divorce Stipulation/Affidavit of Evidence in a Suit for Divorce |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
First Amended Stipulation Affidavit Stipulation/Affidavit of Evidence in a Suit for Divorce |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Hearing Not Needed 07/17/2023 Reset by Court to 09/15/2023 09/15/2023 Reset by Court to 02/15/2024 |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 07/17/2023 Reset by Court to 09/15/2023 09/15/2023 Reset by Court to 02/15/2024 | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Affidavit of Evidence in Suit Stipulation/Affidavit of Evidence in a Suit for Divorce |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
notice Of Intent To Dismiss No Final Order Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 07/17/2023 Reset by Court to 09/15/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.