Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eadie, Richard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Eadie, Jacqueline, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: April 25, 2022Motion
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 20, 2022Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: April 20, 2022Notice of Setting
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: April 12, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 22, 2022Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: March 14, 2022Vacation Letter
Date: October 08, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 12, 2021Letter to Court
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: June 07, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: June 03, 2021Temporary Orders
Date: May 10, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: May 10, 202110 Day Letter
Date: April 28, 2021Scheduling Order
Date: April 19, 2021Amended Notice
Date: March 29, 2021Exhibits
Date: April 16, 2021Original Answer
Date: March 23, 2021Counter Petition
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: March 23, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Retain Case on Docket | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Motion to Enter Judgment (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Hearing Not Needed |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Enter Judgment (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Other CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Other |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel - Brian Schmalbach Order for Withdrawal of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.