Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Garcia, Samuel, represented by Crystal Henderson, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Skeen, Jack, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSkeen, Jack, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Motion Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reveal Evidence Favorable to Accused Motion Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Discovery
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine - Prior Convictions Extraneous Offenses Motion In Limine Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Skeen, Jack, Jr.) Result: Hearing Held
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garcia Application for Bond Reduction Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.