Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Default Hearing filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Request for Setting
Date: April 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Call for Defendant to Appear | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Setting | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Alternative Service | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Alternative Service | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition - Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.