Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Writ Of Attachment filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment
Date: March 05, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment Returned Served | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment BECK, LEVI Served 03/09/2021 | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Attachment | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.