Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Department Of Family And Protective Servies, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Hunt, Leeerla, Dunlap, Nakahless Decurtis, Brown, Rodney, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order of Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2021Order for Required Participation
Date: September 14, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Special Status Order to Participate Other CANCELED Special Status Order to Participate (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Other Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Special Status Order to Participate (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Special Status Order to Participate Other CANCELED Special Status Order to Participate (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Other Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Special Status Order to Participate (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Special Status Order to Participate Other CANCELED Special Status Order to Participate (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Other Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Special Status Order to Participate (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Special Status Order to Participate (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.