Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Waggoner, Holly Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Waggoner, Nicholas Lee, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Setting
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: December 09, 2020Request for Setting
Date: November 10, 2020Application for Protection Order (OCA)
Date: July 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Setting | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter to Clerk | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Enter Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 11/18/2020 Reset by Court to 12/09/2020 | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Setting | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter to Clerk | |
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.