Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Jones, Charles, represented by Cynthia Kent, Jason D. Mazingo, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Order Substituting Counsel
Date: June 07, 2021Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: June 07, 2021Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Benchmark Hearings (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASA Court Report 1.19.2023 Miscellaneous |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PERMANENCY REPORT TO THE COURT PERMANENT MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP Permanency Report to the Court |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing Order | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet:PAPERLESS Docket Sheet |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Casa Court Report | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Benchmark Hearings (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.