Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jury Trial filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Christi Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristi Kennedy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2020 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order Granting Motion
Date: January 15, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: January 14, 2021Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: November 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jackson, Austin Reeve) Other |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jackson, Austin Reeve) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Jackson, Austin Reeve) | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Fact Witness List | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Def's Designation of Expert Witnesses Designation Of Expert Witnesses |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Mediator |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.