Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcguire, Steven Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Miller, Tiffany D., in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Pauper's Letter
Date: February 19, 2020Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved
Date: February 13, 2020Statement of Inability to Pay
Date: January 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Information Form
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pauper's Letter
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Inability to Pay
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.