Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hernandez, Elvia Balderas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Benitz, Jose Alberto Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 04, 2020Citation Returned Served
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served - Sonia Rodriguez Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served - Sonia Rodriguez Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served - Maria Mendoza Subpoena Returned Served Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Witnesses to Appear Via Zoom Motion Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.