Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Queen, Matthew Bryan, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Queen, Leann Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryModification - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Amended Petition
Date: December 04, 2019Statement of Inability to Pay Costs
Date: December 03, 2019Counter Petition
Date: December 03, 2019TRO Returned
Date: December 02, 2019Citation Returned Served
Date: December 02, 2019Notice
Date: November 25, 2019Request for Citation
Date: November 25, 2019Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order
Date: November 22, 2019Citation
Date: November 14, 2019Temporary Restraining Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 13, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: November 13, 2019Request for Citation
Date: November 13, 2019Notice of Setting
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: April 29, 2022Letter to Court
Date: April 20, 2022Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: April 20, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: March 31, 2022Objections
Date: March 25, 2022Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2022Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel
Date: March 02, 2022Letter to Clerk
Date: March 02, 2022Motion for Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 01, 2022Counter Petition
Date: March 01, 2022Original Answer
Date: March 01, 2022Letter to Clerk
Date: March 01, 2022Citation Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2022Citation
Date: February 17, 2022Petition to Modify
Date: February 16, 2022Income Withholding for Support
Date: January 20, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: January 20, 2021Final Decree of Divorce
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: December 10, 2020Objections
Date: December 01, 2020Change of Address
Date: November 30, 2020Letter to the Judge
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: July 27, 2020Mediated Settlement Agreement
Date: July 21, 2020Temporary Orders
Date: July 13, 2020Jury Demand
Date: June 26, 2020Notice of Setting
Date: May 26, 2020Motion
Date: May 22, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: May 22, 2020Motion
Date: February 13, 202010 Day Letter
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Setting
Date: January 14, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: January 14, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 19, 2019Citation
Date: December 19, 2019Intervention
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Setting
Date: December 04, 2019Notice of Setting
Date: July 06, 2022Affidavit
Date: June 15, 2022Amended Counter Petition
Date: June 12, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 08, 2022Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: June 07, 2022Letter to Court
Date: December 01, 2020Statement of Inability to Pay
Date: December 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Notice Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENFORCEMENT HEARING (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 02/21/2023 Reset by Court to 04/10/2023 04/10/2023 Reset by Court to 04/26/2023
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet - Paperless
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship (final) Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
321 NOTICE OF SETTING - Jennifer Notice of Setting Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
10 Day Letter
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 on Final Order Rule 11 Agreement Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 10/18/2022 Reset by Court to 12/06/2022
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.