Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sewell, Joseph John Daniel, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by Christina Davis, against Peterson, Trinity Shae, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: October 06, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: October 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 12/15/2020 Reset by Court to 01/15/2021
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement for Final Orders Rule 11 Agreement Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
No Time Letter - DFPS No Time Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
CLOSED INVST NO TIME LETTER Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.