Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Agreed Judgment filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2015 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Agreed Order
Date: April 19, 2022Letter to Clerk
Date: April 19, 2022Notice of Setting
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Agreed Order Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Clerk
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objections
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
10 Day Letter - Agreed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship 10 Day Letter Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.