Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Agreed Judgment filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 11, 2011 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Amended Petition
Date: March 18, 2021Counter Petition
Date: March 18, 2021Petition to Modify
Date: March 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Amended Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Amended Petition Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Counterpetition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Counter Petition Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Original Answer Original Answer Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRO Returned
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation & TRO
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Petition to Modify Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.