Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jernigan, John Gabriel, Sr., filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Johnson, Abraham, Johnson, Myra K., in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition: presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Converted Disposition: Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryModification - Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Motion to Pay Court Appointed Attorney Fee
Date: October 09, 2020Precept to Serve Returned Unserved
Date: February 01, 2019Order Enforcing Child Support and Medical Support
Date: April 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Modify (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 03/08/2024 Reset by Court to 03/05/2024 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet - Paperless | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN MAIL Returned Mail |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service - Myra Jernigan-Johnson Waiver of Service |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement of Inability to Pay Costs | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Motion |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion To Modify (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition: |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.