Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chaney, Trey filed a(n) Violate Promise To Appear case against Duron, Dionisio, Iv, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP2 with Beaty, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeaty, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2016 |
CategoryViolate Promise To Appear |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CASE DOCUMENTS | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Comment | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant Recalled | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Comment | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Sent to Collection Agency | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | OMNI | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.