Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Failure To Appear case against Dailey, Larry John, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP2 with Beaty, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeaty, Nancy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2013 |
CategoryFailure To Appear |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CASE DOCUMENTS | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE DOCKET | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.