Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lofland, William B. filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2008 |
CategoryGuardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING ANNUAL REPORT | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ANNUAL REPORT | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING ANNUAL REPORT | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ANNUAL REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.