Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Judin, Kim filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Winton, Michael Lamar, represented by Lee, Ryan K, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve Return | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Plea | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Indictment (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.