Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hobbs, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Goudarzi, Brent, against Pennington Mechanical, Llc, Hindman, Joshua Randall, represented by Martin, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Vacation Notice | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.