Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gary L Rainsdon, As Trustee Of The Bankruptcy Estate Of Peter Michael Lesbo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Warren, Lynn G., against Crum, Jason, Ident Marking Services, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.