Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Argonaut Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cannon, Steven K, against Goggans, Kenneth, 31 Group, Llc, 31 Operating, Llc, 31 Holdings I, Llc, represented by Potter, Chase J, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Check | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Contempt | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Conf w/Judge | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Objections | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.