Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Otto, Amanda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rogers, Scott L, against Hill Brothers Transportation, Inc., Mcintosh, Scott D., represented by Downs, Jay R., in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 382nd District Court with Hall, Brett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Brett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House382nd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Mediation Order | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | No Fee Document | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Substitute Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.