Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Retail Capital Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jones, John R, against Floyd, Jim Carl, Jr., Studio Fitness Llc, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Process Return | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.