Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Burnside, Elizabeth, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Burnside, Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Cross Action - Family | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Return | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.