Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Cravey , Paul Alexander, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stonecypher Cravey , Lesley, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts 439th District Court with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRakow, David E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House439th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Bureau of Vital Statistics | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | 306A Letter | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Enter | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Decree of Divorce | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 11 | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.